skip to content

Kristof, Francis Eugene

CPSO#: 21855

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 10 Aug 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 07 Jan 2004

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:Medical University of Semmelweis, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.


Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  November 24, 2016
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
By way of letter dated November 28, 2016, the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario received notification from the Chief of Staff of Hopital Glengarry Memorial Hospital that a temporary suspension of Dr. Kristof’s privileges was implemented effective November 24, 2016.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:13 Nov 1962 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 1969
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 25 Nov 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2004
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Aug 2017