Krishnan, Pradeep (CPSO#: 98956)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 2017

Expiry Date:  31 May 2024

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jun 2017

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Rajasthan University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick children
Division of
Paediatric Neuroradiology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite AG31
2075 BAYVIEW AVENUE
Sunny Brook Health Sciences Centre
TORONTO
Toronto ON  M4N3M5
Canada
Phone: 4164806100 Ext. 2495
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Burute Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 08 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Krishnan ( CPSO# 98956 )
Dr. N. Burute ( CPSO# 101344)

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health
Sciences Center
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Business Address:
58 Goodall Street
Dryden ON  P8N 2Z6
Phone Number: (807) 223-8200

Business Address:
125 Hogan Road
Nipigon ON  P0T 2J0
Phone Number: (807) 887-3026

Business Address:
20B Cartier Road
Box 370
Terrace Bay ON  P0T 2W0
Phone Number: (807) 825-3273

Business Address:
26 Peninsula Road
Box 780
Marathon ON  P0T 2E0
Phone Number: (807) 229-1740

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jun 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 02 Sep 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 03 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 May 2017
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jul 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Apr 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 May 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2017
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 31 May 2024

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jun 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Pradeep Krishnan may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medical
                        Imaging,  University  of  Toronto,  in  which Dr. Krishnan holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires  seven  years  from
                  the  date  of  issuance or when Dr. Krishnan no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate  of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the  Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  College receives  a  report  indicating  that  Dr.  Krishnan's
                        clinical  performance,  knowledge,  skill,  judgment,  professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not  receive  an annual report or receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when   the  Committee  makes  a  decision  about   Dr.   Krishnan's
                        certificate   of   registration,  following  consideration  of  the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on  June  1,  2017.   In  accordance  with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above,  this  certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on May 31, 2024.