skip to content

Krishna, Lalit

CPSO#: 89782

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Aug 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Aug 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Université de Montréal Faculté de Médeci, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Maitland Valley Medical Centre
180 Cambria Road North
Goderich ON  N7A 4N8
Phone: (519) 524-6060
Fax: (519) 524-5225 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

Alexandra Marine & General Hospital
120 Napier Street
Goderich ON  N7A 1W5
Canada
Phone: (519) 524-8323
County: County of Huron
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Krishna Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 13 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Krishna ( CPSO# 89782 )

Business Address:
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
120 Napier Street
Goderich ON  N7A 1W5
Phone Number: (519) 524-8689

Business Address:
Maitland Valley Medical Centre
180 Cambria Road North
Goderich ON  N7A 4N8
Phone Number: (519) 524-6060

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Aug 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LALIT KRISHNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRISHNA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2008