skip to content

Krings, Timo

CPSO#: 89227

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Jan 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 27 Jan 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:Rheinisch-Westfalische Tech Hochschule, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2017
Corporation Name: Krings Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Krings ( CPSO# 89227 )

Business Address:
UHN - Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Neuroradiology
Room 3MCL - 430
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5562

Business Address:
600 University Avenue
5th Floor - Room 562
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
NCSB - 585 University Avenue
Room 1C-546
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Business Address:
610 University Avenue
3rd Floor, Room 918
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:27 Jan 2021 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2008
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 08 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jan 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Jan 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 09 Feb 2021 Active
 Dr. TIMO KRINGS may practise medicine independently in diagnostic radiology.