skip to content

Krieger, Howard Marvin

CPSO#: 25085

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Aug 1972
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Apr 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Woods Park LTC
110 Lillian Cres.
Barrie ON  L4N 5H7 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Cmha
90 Mulcaster St.
Barrie ON  L4M 3M5
Canada
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HOWARD MARVIN KRIEGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRIEGER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1972
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 11 Sep 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 12 Sep 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2019