skip to content

Krieger, Henry

CPSO#: 23562

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jun 1971
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Sep 1974

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University Of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite 318
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone: (416) 289-2166
Fax: (416) 289-2168 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Henry Krieger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 27 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Krieger ( CPSO# 23562 )

Business Address:
318 - 3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone Number: (416) 289-2166

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:01 Jan 1974 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective:01 Jan 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HENRY KRIEGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRIEGER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jul 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 1974