skip to content

Kraw, Nicholas Michael

CPSO#: 25750

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Sep 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Oct 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish, Russian, Ukrainian

Education:University of Western Australia, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:15 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1972 to 30 Jun 1973
CF - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Sep 2011