skip to content

Kravetz, Arnold Israel

CPSO#: 28335

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Jun 1976
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1976

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 719
115 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 0A9
Phone: (416) 746-1617 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Arnold I. Kravetz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 20 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kravetz ( CPSO# 28335 )

Business Address:
719-115 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 0A9
Phone Number: (416) 746-1617


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 17 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ARNOLD ISRAEL KRAVETZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRAVETZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1976