skip to content

Krasnopolsky, Marina

CPSO#: 89677

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Aug 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Aug 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Ross University School of Medicine, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1396 Donmills Rd
B106
Toronto ON  M3B 3N1
Phone: (416) 441-9500
Fax: (416) 441-9501 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

2 champagne drive
Unit C8
Toronto ON  M3J2C5
Canada
Phone: 4163981515
Fax: 4163981516
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Rozen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Corporation Name: Dr. M. Krasnopolsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 10 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Rozen ( CPSO# 89605 )
Dr. M. Krasnopolsky ( CPSO# 89677 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jan 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Dec 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Dec 2009

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Dec 2009 Active
             Dr. Marina Krasnopolsky may practise medicine independently in family medicine,
            only.