Krakowsky, Yonah Ian (CPSO#: 95755)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Murray Koffler Urologic Centre
60 murray st, 6th floor, Box 19
Toronto ON  M5T3L9
Phone: 4165864800 Ext. 3917
Fax: 6478375815
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yonah Krakowsky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Krakowsky ( CPSO# 95755 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YONAH IAN KRAKOWSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRAKOWSKY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2017