skip to content

Kraft, Claudia Suzanne

CPSO#: 90495

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 Nov 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jun 2015