skip to content

Kraag, Gunnar Robert

CPSO#: 24338

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Oct 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Oct 2022

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Queen's University, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Dr
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kraag Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 7 2019
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

The Ottawa Hospital (Medical Records)
1967 Riverside Dr
Ottawa ON K1H 7W9
Date Received: 02 May 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:06 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective:18 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GUNNAR ROBERT KRAAG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRAAG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2022