skip to content

Kozloff, Nicole Rachel

CPSO#: 91600

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre for Addiction and Mental Hea
1025 Queen Street West, B1-4345
Toronto ON  M6J 1H1
Phone: 4165358501 Ext. 30769
Fax: 416-260-4197 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Horizons for Youth
c/o Inner City Health Associates
59 Adelaide St. E. 2nd floor
Toronto, ON M5C 1K6
Toronto ON  M5C 1K6
Canada
Phone: 416-591-4411
Fax: 416-640-2072
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Skylark Children, Youth & Families
40 Orchard View Blvd. Suite 102
Toronto ON  M4R1B9
Canada
Phone: 4164820081 Ext. 282
Fax: 4164825055
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Drucker and Kozloff Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Drucker ( CPSO# 90678 )
Dr. N. Kozloff ( CPSO# 91600 )

Business Address:
CAMH
7th Floor
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Business Address:
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-7546

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:31 Dec 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective:31 Dec 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NICOLE RACHEL KOZLOFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOZLOFF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 2015