skip to content

Koziel, Nicole Candida

CPSO#: 88821

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
7th Floor, Women's Mental Health
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B1
Phone: (416) 323-6400 Ext. 4049 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NICOLE CANDIDA KOZIEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOZIEL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jul 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013