skip to content

Koziar, Mary Louise

CPSO#: 27394

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 May 2021
EXPIRY DATE
18 May 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1975

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Mary Koziar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 08 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Koziar ( CPSO# 27394 )

Business Address:
11 Gibb Street
Oshawa ON  L1H 2J9
Phone Number: (905) 579-1212


Corporation Name: M. Koziar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 16 2012

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 May 2021