skip to content

Koziak, Steven Joseph

CPSO#: 27091

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Steven J. Koziak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 17 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Dr. Kevin Velicaria 1 - 1440 Main St E Hamilton ON L8K 1C4
Date Received: 15 May 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019