Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: November 2, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Waldemar Jacek Kozerawski to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 2nd, 2020:
Dr. Kozerawski entered into an undertaking with the College dated April 11, 2019, in which he agreed to undergo remediation in Cannabis prescribing, billing for uninsured services, ethics and record keeping. In lieu of completing the terms of the April 11, 2019 undertaking, Dr. Kozerawski ceased prescribing Cannabis on August 12, 2019 and has agreed to cease all practice relating to Cannabis until certain conditions are met.
Dr. Kozerawski must post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of all Practice Locations, which states as follows:
IMPORTANT NOTICE
Dr. Kozerawski is prohibited from practicing in relation to Cannabis, including:
(i)The prescription, dispensing or administration of Cannabis;
(ii)Signing medical documents pursuant to the Cannabis Regulations, SOR/2018-144, or any equivalent documents, or participating in any way in the preparation, issuance or support of Cannabis documents, except for the sole and limited purpose of referring patients to other healthcare providers;
(iii)Any counselling, assessment or treatment of patients that in any way relates to Cannabis, except for the sole purposes of referring patients to other healthcare providers for such counselling, assessment or treatment.
Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: May 16, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:
Download Full Document (PDF)