skip to content

Koyle, Martin Allan

CPSO#: 96296

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jul 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Paediatric Urology
Black Wing, Room 299
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6580
Fax: (416) 813-7869 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective:06 Nov 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 May 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 16 May 2013 Active
                   Dr.  Martin Allan Koyle may practise medicine independently in paediatric
                  urology and transplant, only.
                  
                  

Concerns

Source: FSMB (USA)
Notice Type Discipline Findings in Other Jurisdictions
Active Date: May 06, 2019
Summary: Where a disciplinary finding is made against a member on or after September 1, 2015 by a medical regulatory or licensing authority in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding to be posted on the register, if the finding is known to the College. The following are non-Ontario disciplinary findings made against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information: On May 6, 2019, the Medical Board of California issued a public letter of reprimand to Dr. Koyle. The caution ordered by the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario in 2018 constitutes a violation of the California Business and Professions Code, and the California Medical Board states that the public reprimand is considered disciplinary action. The College was notified of this disciplinary action by a report received on May 10, 2019.

 

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: September 19, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)