skip to content

Kowtecky, Philip Andrew

CPSO#: 93697

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Feb 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
835 King St W
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Philip A. Kowtecky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 31 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:14 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PHILIP ANDREW KOWTECKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOWTECKY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 28 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 29 Aug 2011 to 28 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 29 Jul 2012 to 19 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2013