skip to content

Kowalczuk, Marcin

CPSO#: 95944

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education: McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
65 Bayly St W
Ajax ON  L1S 7K7
Phone: (905) 426-2233
Fax: (905) 426-3306 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

580 Harwood Ave S
Lakeridge Health Ajax Pickering Hos
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Canada
Phone: (905) 683-2320
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Marcin Kowalczuk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 26 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kowalczuk ( CPSO# 95944 )

Business Address:
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 428-5339

Business Address:
65 Bayly St W
Ajax ON  L1S 7K7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARCIN KOWALCZUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOWALCZUK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Jul 2018
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 12 Jul 2021 to 30 Nov 2021
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2017