skip to content

Kovaleva, Maria

CPSO#: 94350

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 15 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 23 Aug 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Tajik State medical University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Maria Kovaleva Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 7 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Aug 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Jun 2015