skip to content

Kouwenberg, Jennifer Lara

CPSO#: 89551

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Jul 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jan 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J.L. Kouwenberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 11 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: QHC Regional Pediatrics Services Consulting Group Suite 305 274 Dundas St E Belleville ON K8N 1E6
Date Received: 26 Jul 2017


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:22 Nov 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 26 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 27 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 27 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 28 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jul 2017