skip to content

Koutelas, Nikolaos

CPSO#: 94508

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Dec 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Dec 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:Ross University School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3950 Dougall Ave
Windsor ON  N9G 1X2
Phone: (519) 974-9778
Fax: 5199746479 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

3840 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N9E 3N9
Canada
Phone: (519) 972-3944
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

13278 Tecumseh Rd. E
Windsor ON  N8N 3T6
Canada
Phone: (519) 979-5260
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

186 Talbot St. S
Essex ON  N8M 1B6
Canada
Phone: (519) 776-1559
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

15 Mill St. E
Tilbury ON  N0P 2L0
Canada
Phone: 519-682-3699
County: County of Kent
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Nikolaos Koutelas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 24 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Koutelas ( CPSO# 94508 )

Business Address:
3950 Dougall Avenue
Suite 2
Windsor ON  N9G 1X2
Phone Number: (519) 974-9778

Business Address:
13278 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8N 3T6
Phone Number: (519) 979-5260

Business Address:
3840 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N9E 3N9
Phone Number: (519) 972-3944

Business Address:
15 Mill Street East
Tilbury ON  N0P 2L0
Phone Number: (519) 682-3699

Business Address:
186 Talbot Street South
Essex ON  N8M 1B6
Phone Number: (519) 776-1559

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:21 Nov 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NIKOLAOS KOUTELAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOUTELAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 19 Oct 2010 to 11 Jan 2011
AVP - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 12 Jan 2011 to 18 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 19 Oct 2011 to 18 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2012