skip to content

Koudys, Deborah Mary

CPSO#: 31647

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Jun 1980
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Koudys Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 22 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Koudys ( CPSO# 31647 )

Business Address:
101 - 1055 Fanshawe Park Road
London ON  N6G 5B4
Phone Number: (519) 472-0040

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients seeking access to a copy of their recor may contact: 101-1055 Fanshawe Park Rd London ON N6G 5B4 Tel: 519-472-0040
Date Received: 26 Sep 2019

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DEBORAH MARY KOUDYS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOUDYS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1980