skip to content

Kotnis, Nikhil Arun

CPSO#: 91336

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 14 Jun 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Aug 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Leicester, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 17 Aug 2009
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 18 Aug 2009 to 14 Jun 2010
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 2010