skip to content

Kostovic, Biljana

CPSO#: 92720

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 May 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 20 Feb 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bosnian, English

Education:University of Sarajevo, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CPM
312 Queen St E
Brampton ON  L6V 1C2
Phone: 905- 458-7377 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

123 Edward Street 1118
Toronto ON  M5G1E2
Canada
Phone: 416-593-7700
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1849 Yonge Street, suite 810
Toronto ON  M4S1Y2
Canada
Phone: 6475218024
Fax: 4163488024
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. B. Kostovic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 21 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Kostovic ( CPSO# 92720 )

Business Address:
Suite 1118
123 Edward Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Phone Number: (416) 593-7700

Business Address:
312 Queen Street East
Brampton ON  L6V 1C2
Phone Number: (905) 458-7377

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:04 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 May 2010
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Feb 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 20 Feb 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 09 Mar 2021 Active
 (1 of 2)
As from March 8, 2021, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and
limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Biljana Kostovic, in
accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Kostovic to the College
of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
("Undertaking")

of

DR. BILJANA KOSTOVIC
("Dr. Kostovic")

to 

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")


A.	PREAMBLE

(1)	In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended; 

"Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;

"IEP" means Individualized Education Plan;

"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan; 

"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the public;

"QAC" means the Quality Assurance Committee of the College.

(2)	I, Dr. Kostovic, certificate of registration number 92720, am a member of the College.  

(3)	I, Dr. Kostovic, acknowledge that concerns have been identified with respect to my knowledge, skill and judgment. I am aware of the College's concern about protecting the public.

B.	UNDERTAKING

(4)	I, Dr. Kostovic, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(5)	Clinical Supervision

(a)	I, Dr. Kostovic, undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical supervisor or supervisors acceptable to the College (the "Clinical  
Supervisor" or "Clinical Supervisors"), for a minimum of three (3) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 

(b)		I, Dr. Kostovic, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking attached hereto as Appendix "A", and understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum:

(i)	Facilitate the education program set out in the IEP attached as Appendix "B";

(ii)	Review the materials provided by the College and have an orientation session with me, including to discuss the objectives for the Clinical Supervision;

(iii)	Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location approved by the College, once every month;

(iv)	Review at least fifteen (15) of my patient charts at every meeting;

(v)	Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;

(vi)	Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and ongoing professional development and inquire into my compliance with the recommendations;

(vii)	Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical Supervision; and

(viii)	Submit one (1) written report to the College at the end of the three (3) months of Clinical Supervision, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor has concerns about my standard of practice.

(c)	I, Dr. Kostovic, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs identified in the IEP set out at Appendix "B" to my Undertaking, as well as the areas of concern identified in the report of the assessor, dated July 24, 2020, and concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.

(d)	I, Dr. Kostovic, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical Supervision of my practice described in section (5) of this Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and undertake to abide by the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not limited to recommended practice improvements and ongoing professional development. 

(e)	I, Dr. Kostovic, acknowledge that in making its determination that I may return to unsupervised practice, the College may require that I sign a further undertaking imposing terms, conditions and limitations on my certificate of registration or requiring ongoing re-assessments, clinical supervision and/or monitoring. 

(f)	I, Dr. Kostovic, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within forty-five (45) days of the date I execute this Undertaking. 

(g)	I, Dr. Kostovic, undertake that if a person who has given an undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the College within that time.

(h)	I, Dr. Kostovic, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical Supervisor as set out in sections (5)(f) and (5)(g) above, including returning a signed Appendix "A" within forty-five (45) days, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  

(i)	I, Dr. Kostovic, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise as a result of section (5)(h) above this will constitute a term, condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and said term, condition or limitation will be included on the Public Register.

(6)	Professional Education

(a)	I, Dr. Kostovic, undertake to participate in and successfully complete the following professional education (the "Professional Education"): 

(i)	CMPA's Documentation: Principles of Medical Record Keeping e-Learning Module; 

(ii)	Review, reflection and discussion with my Clinical Supervisor of CPSO's Medical Records Documentation policy; 

(iii)	Review, reflection and discussion with my Clinical Supervisor of resources provided by EMR to enhance effective and efficient use of EMR; 

(iv)	all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B"; and

(v)	any additional professional education recommended by my Clinical Supervisor.

(b)	I, Dr. Kostovic, undertake to provide proof to the College of my successful completion of the Professional Education, including proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully completed the Professional Education.

(c)	I, Dr. Kostovic, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the Professional Education.

(d)	I, Dr. Kostovic, undertake to complete this requirement within three (3) months of executing this Undertaking or, if no satisfactory program is available by that time, by the first possible opportunity thereafter.

(7)	Reassessment of Practice  

(a)	I, Dr. Kostovic, undertake that, after receiving the report of the Clinical Supervisor, if the College is of the view that there remain concerns, after the completion of the Clinical Supervision and the Professional Education set out above and in Appendix "A" and Appendix "B" attached, I will submit to a reassessment of my practice (the "Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor" or "Assessors").  I acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review of a minimum of fifteen (15) charts, direct observation of my care, interviews with me, colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients, and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.

(b)	I, Dr. Kostovic, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment conducted under section (7) of this Undertaking. 

(c)	I, Dr. Kostovic, acknowledge and provide consent that my Clinical Supervisor may receive and review the findings of the Assessor, and may discuss with the Assessor any issues or concerns arising from the Reassessment. 

(d)	I, Dr. Kostovic, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and the Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College. 

(8)	Monitoring

(a)	I, Dr. Kostovic, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

(b)	I, Dr. Kostovic, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

C.	ACKNOWLEDGEMENT 

(9)	I, Dr. Kostovic, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(10)	I, Dr. Kostovic, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

(11)	I, Dr. Kostovic, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(12)	I, Dr. Kostovic, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

(13)	I, Dr. Kostovic, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in any one or more of the following: consideration by the QAC, an investigation by the College, or further action by the College, including a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee.

(14)	I, Dr. Kostovic, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

(15)	Public Register

(a)	I, Dr. Kostovic, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b)	I, Dr. Kostovic, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Kostovic's knowledge, skill and judgment. As a result:

	Dr. Kostovic will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 3 months. 

	Dr. Kostovic will engage in professional education in medical record keeping and will review resources provided by EMR to enhance effective and efficient use of EMR.

	Dr. Kostovic's practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College, only if after receiving the Clinical Supervisor's report, the College is of the view that there remain concerns. 

D.	CONSENT

(16)	I, Dr. Kostovic, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(17)	I, Dr. Kostovic, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix "C".

(18)	I, Dr. Kostovic, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following information to any person who facilitates my completion of the Professional Education and to all Clinical Supervisors and Assessors:

(a)	any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking;

(b)	any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, my practice; and 

(c)	any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(19)	I, Dr. Kostovic, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(20)	I, Dr. Kostovic, give my irrevocable consent to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff, Assessors, and any persons who facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any information:

(a)	relevant to this Undertaking;

(b)	relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking set out at Appendix "A";

(c)	relevant to the Reassessment;

(d)	relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking; and  

(e)	which comes to their attention in the course of providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.


(2 of 2) 
As from February 20, 2019, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and
limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Biljana Kostovic, in
accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Kostovic to the College
of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
("Undertaking")
                  
of
                  
DR. BILJANA KOSTOVIC
("Dr. Kostovic)
                  
to 
                  
COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")
                  
                  
                  
A.    PREAMBLE

(1)   In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O.  1991, c. 18, as
amended; 
                  
"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
 public; 
                  
"QAC" means the Quality Assurance Committee of the College.
                  
(2)   I, Dr.  Kostovic,  certificate  of  registration   number  92720,  am  a
member  of  the College.  I acknowledge that the College  has concerns
with respect  to my care and treatment of patients  in my  Emergency
Medicine/ Urgent  Care  practice.    I  am  aware  of  the  College 's
concern  about protecting  the public.

B.    UNDERTAKING

(3)   I, Dr. Kostovic, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
Undertaking, effective upon the date this Undertaking is approved by the
QAC ("Effective Date").

(4)   Practice Restrictions

I, Dr. Kostovic,  undertake   that  I will  not practise  Emergency
Medicine/Urgent Care  in any jurisdiction until each and every one of the
following conditions have been met:
                  
                  
(a)   I provide a minimum of forty-five (45) days' notice to the College
 of my intent to return to the practice of Emergency Medicine/
Urgent Care;
                  
(b)   I   provide  the  College with proof that I am participating in a
program of continuing professional development that meets the
requirements for continuing professional development of the Royal
College  of Physicians  and Surgeons  of Canada,  the College  of
Family Physicians of Canada, or an organization  that has been
approved by the College for that purpose that meets the
requirements for continuing professional development set by the
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons  of Canada or the College
of Family Physicians of Canada; and
                  
(c)   The College approves my return to the practice of Emergency
Medicine/Urgent Care.
                  
(5)   I , Dr. Kostovic, agree that if the College has approved  my return to
the practice of Emergency Medicine/Urgent   Care,  pursuant  to  the
terms  of  this  Undertaking,  I    will  participate  in  the education
and  remediation,  as set out  in the Individualized Education  Plan
(IEP) attached as Appendix "A" to this Undertaking.  I agree that this
will include obtaining and practising under a clinical supervisor
acceptable to the College for a period of at least twelve (12) months.  I
acknowledge  that  I   will  participate  in the education  and
remediation  set out  in the IEP if  I intend to return to an Emergency
Medicine/Urgent Care practice prior to May 2020.

(6)   I, Dr. Kostovic, agree that if I  intend to return to an Emergency
Medicine/Urgent Care practice after  May 2020,  I will apply  to the
College  under the  Policy  relating to changing  scope of practice
and/or  re-entry to practice that is in effect  at the time of my
application  (currently, Ensuring Competence:  Changing  Scope  of
Practice  and /or  Re-entering  Practice).  I further agree to abide by
all of the terms of any education program required by the College in
order to return to an Emergency Medicine/Urgent Care practice.

C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENTS

(7)   I, Dr. Kostovic, acknowledge and agree that I practise in Interventional
Pain Management. I further acknowledge that I am bound by the College's
Policy entitled Ensuring Competence: Changing Scope of Practice and /or
Re-entering Practice.

(8)   I, Dr. Kostovic, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(9)   I, Dr.  Kostovic,  acknowledge that  in  considering my  request  to
return  to  the  practice  of Emergency Medicine/Urgent Care, the College
may, among other things:

(a)   request that I agree to specified terms, conditions  or limitations
being placed upon my certificate of registration; and
                  
(b)   request that I  enter into an appropriate assessment and /or
monitoring agreement with the College.
                  
(10)  I, Dr. Kostovic, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
Undertaking.

(11)  I,  Dr.  Kostovic,   acknowledge that I have read and understand the
provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
counsel  in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
right to do so.

(12)  I, Dr.  Kostovic,  acknowledge that a breach  by me of any  provision  of
this  Undertaking  may constitute an act of professional misconduct and
/or incompetence, and may result  in any one or more  of  the following:
consideration by the QAC, an  investigation by the College,  or further
action  by the College,  including  a referral  of specified  allegations
to the Discipline Committee of the College.

(13)  I, Dr. Kostovic, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
 conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
 purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

(14)  Public Register

(a)   I, Dr. Kostovic, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall  be posted on
the Public Register.
                  
(b)   I, Dr.  Kostovic,   acknowledge that,  in  addition   to  this
Undertaking  being  posted  in accordance with  subsection 14(a)
above,  the following summary shall  be posted on the Public
Register  during  the time period that this Undertaking remains  in
effect:
                  
Dr.  Kostovic has ceased to practise Emergency Medicine and
Urgent Care in all jurisdictions.
                  
D.    CONSENT

(15)  I, Dr.  Kostovic,  give  my  irrevocable consent  to the  College  to
make  appropriate enquiries  of OHIP  and/or  any  person  who or
institution  that may have  relevant information, in order for the
College  to monitor  my compliance with the provisions  of this
Undertaking.

(16)  I, Dr.  Kostovic, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
attached hereto as Appendix "B" and that the consent forms part of this
Undertaking.



Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: March 8, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Biljana Kostovic to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 8, 2021:

Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Kostovic’s knowledge, skill and judgment. As a result:

Dr. Kostovic will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 3 months.

Dr. Kostovic will engage in professional education in medical record keeping and will review resources provided by EMR to enhance effective and efficient use of EMR.

Dr. Kostovic’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College, only if after receiving the Clinical Supervisor’s report, the College is of the view that there remain concerns.

 

Source: Member
Active Date: February 20, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Biljana Kostovic to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 20, 2019:

Dr. Kostovic has ceased to practise Emergency Medicine and Urgent Care in all jurisdictions.