skip to content

Kos, Zuzana

CPSO#: 86761

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 04 Nov 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Zuzana Kos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 7 2020

Medical Records Location

Address: The Ottawa Hospital 501 Smyth Road Ottawa, Ontario K1H 8L6
Date Received: 07 May 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:31 Dec 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 18 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 19 Dec 2010 to 18 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 19 Dec 2011 to 18 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 19 Dec 2012 to 18 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 19 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
CF - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020