skip to content

Korman, Helen Shirley

CPSO#: 30821

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 13 Jul 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Korman-Miller, Helen Shirley (used until: 10 Aug 1993 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Yiddish

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: PO Box 1164 Mercer Island, WA 98040 USA
Date Received: 13 Jul 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 11 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Jul 2015