skip to content

Korda, Andrew

CPSO#: 26994

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Sep 1974
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1985

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1294 Weston Road
Toronto ON  M6M 4R3
Phone: (416) 243-0700 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew Korda Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Korda ( CPSO# 26994 )
Dr. R. Korda ( CPSO# 82936 )

Business Address:
1294 Weston Road
Toronto ON  M6M 4R3
Phone Number: (416) 243-0700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
West Park Healthcare Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1979 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREW KORDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KORDA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 1974
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Nov 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1985