skip to content

Kopplin, Peter Arthur

CPSO#: 21962

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Jun 1969
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1969

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
602 Melita Crescent
Toronto ON  M6G 3Z5
Phone: (416) 530-4482
Fax: 416 530-1686 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 20 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PETER ARTHUR KOPPLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOPPLIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1963
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1964
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1969