skip to content

Koppikar, Sahil

CPSO#: 103051

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
Division of Adult Rheumatology
76 Grenville Street
4th Floor
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-6344
Fax: 416-323-6115 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective:07 Oct 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SAHIL KOPPIKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOPPIKAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Aug 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 31 Jul 2020
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018