skip to content

Kopolovic, Ilana Rebecca

CPSO#: 97015

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health
Durham Regional Cancer Centre
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 3625
Fax: (905) 721-4741 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ilana Kopolovic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 03 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Kopolovic ( CPSO# 97015 )

Business Address:
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective:30 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ILANA REBECCA KOPOLOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOPOLOVIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 20 Nov 2011 to 18 Dec 2011
EL - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 07 May 2012 to 01 Jun 2012
EL - Hematology

University of Toronto, 02 Jun 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
EL - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 27 Jul 2012
EL - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 May 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jul 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014