skip to content

Shirkool, Koorosh

CPSO#: 89233

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education: Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
399 Bathurst St
Toronto Western Hospital
General Neurology Clinic
West Wing- 5th Floor
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: 416 603 5232
Fax: 416 603 6402 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

300-440 Bathurst St
Toronto Western Family Health Team
Toronto ON  M5T 2S6
Canada
Phone: 416.603.5800 Ext. 3289
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

106-3133 Sheppard Ave E
HeartHealth Medical Centre
Scarborough ON  M1T 3J7
Canada
Phone: 416-491-1555
Fax: 416-491-4765
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KOOROSH SHIRKOOL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHIRKOOL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
AVP - Neurology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013