skip to content

Koobair, Sandhya

CPSO#: 86135

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Mar 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Mar 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5565 Wyandotte Street East
Windsor ON  N8S 4T9
Phone: (519) 974-6147
Fax: (519) 974-6920 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X3V7
Canada
Phone: 5199032469
Fax: 5199746920
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Koobair Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Koobair ( CPSO# 86135 )

Business Address:
109 - 2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 258-7181

Business Address:
5565 Wyandotte Street East
Windsor ON  N8S 4T9
Phone Number: (519) 974-6147

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:06 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SANDHYA KOOBAIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOOBAIR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 May 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 May 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Apr 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2008