skip to content

Kontolemos, Mario

CPSO#: 96462

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 May 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 May 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Medical Imaging
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4054 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Mario Kontolemos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Braidwood ( CPSO# 89044 )
Dr. M. Kontolemos ( CPSO# 96462 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Neuroradiology
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4832

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6

Business Address:
1125 Colonel By Drive
Ottawa ON  K1S 5B6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Neuroradiology Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARIO KONTOLEMOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KONTOLEMOS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 May 2015