skip to content

Kong, Yuan

CPSO#: 90442

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
8787 woodbine Ave, Unit 126
Markham ON  L3R 9S2
Phone: 905-513-6870
Fax: (905) 513-5722 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Yuan Kong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 09 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Kong ( CPSO# 90442 )

Business Address:
Suite 307
164 Queen Street East
Brampton ON  L6V 1B4
Phone Number: (905) 595-0456

Business Address:
Suite 126
8787 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 9S2
Phone Number: (905) 513-6870

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective:30 Nov 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. YUAN KONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 04 Jun 2009 to 26 Jun 2009
EL - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 23 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2012