skip to content

Kong, Jennifer Hoi-Yan

CPSO#: 95254

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Fairview Community Health
5 Fairview Mall Drive, Suite 359
Toronto ON  M2J 2Z1
Phone: (416) 640-5298
Fax: (416) 642-2238 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lansdowne and Dundas Medical Clinic
222 Lansdowne Ave.
Toronto ON  M6K3C6
Canada
Phone: (647) 725-6555
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Church and Carlton Medical Clinic
60 Carlton St.
Toronto ON  M5B1J2
Canada
Phone: (416) 646-1890
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JENNIFER HOI-YAN KONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2014 to 31 Mar 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 08 Apr 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013