skip to content

Kong, Grace Joanne

CPSO#: 89603

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of London, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone: (905) 683-2320
Fax: (905) 683-6387 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

381 Church St.
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Canada
Phone: (905) 472-7000
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Grace Kong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 03 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Kong ( CPSO# 89603 )

Business Address:
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Business Address:
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
700 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5S9

Business Address:
181 Bay street
Toronto ON  M5J 2T3
Phone Number: (905) 648-4347

Business Address:
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7373


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Maryland

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist
Anesthesiology Effective:08 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GRACE JOANNE KONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 15 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 06 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2008