skip to content

Komorowsky, Andrei Wolodymyr

CPSO#: 96150

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: 519 685 8500 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

Michael Garron Hospital
Emergency Department
825 Coxwell Ave
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Canada
Phone: 416 461 6435
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: A.W. Komorowsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 05 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kempinska ( CPSO# 84535 )
Dr. A. Komorowsky ( CPSO# 96150 )

Business Address:
Michael Garron Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 461-8272

Business Address:
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON  N6A 5W9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREI WOLODYMYR KOMOROWSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOMOROWSKY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Emergency Medicine

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016