skip to content

Komer, Lawrence David

CPSO#: 26092

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Sep 1973
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Sep 1973

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
960 Cumberland Ave
Suite E
Burlington ON  L7N 3J6
Phone: (905) 639-2571
Fax: (905) 639-7647 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Lawrence D. Komer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 25 2019
Corporation Name: Dr. Lawrence D. Komer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Komer ( CPSO# 26092 )

Business Address:
960 Cumberland Avenue
Suite E
Burlington ON  L7N 3J6
Phone Number: (905) 639-2571

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:08 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LAWRENCE DAVID KOMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOMER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 1973