skip to content

Israel, Koma Diryawish

CPSO#: 74647

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Nov 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, Assyrian, English

Education:University of Baghdad, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
7-1394 Upper Gage Ave
Hamilton ON  L8W 1E7
Phone: (905) 529-8111 Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KOMA DIRYAWISH ISRAEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISRAEL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 May 2000
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 May 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 13 May 2019
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 14 May 2019
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 14 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2019

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 13 May 2019
Summary:

On May 13, 2019, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Koma Diraywish Israel committed 
an act of professional misconduct in that he engaged in acts or omissions relevant to the practice 
of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by 
members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, pursuant to paragraph 1(1)33 of 
Ontario regulation 856/93 made under the Medicine Act, 1991. 
 
FACTS 
 
Dr. Koma Diryawish Israel (“Dr. Israel”) is a 64-year-old general physician who practices in 
Hamilton, Ontario.  He received his certificate of registration authorizing independent practice in 
2000. 
 
Dr. Israel was Patient A’s family doctor between approximately November 2013 and May 2017.   
 
During an appointment with Patient A, Dr. Israel told Patient A that a woman needs a man and 
that maybe her problem was that she did not have a husband or boyfriend. Dr. Israel also asked 
Patient A, in an inappropriate and unprofessional manner, whether she was attaining sexual 
satisfaction by masturbating. 
 
Dr. Israel has no previous history before the Discipline Committee. 
 
DISPOSITION 
 
On May 13, 2019, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
-  the Registrar suspend Dr. Israel’s certificate of registration for a period of one (1) month, 
   commencing from May 14, 2019 at 12:01 a.m. 
-  the Registrar place the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Israel’s certificate 
   of registration: 
   o     Dr. Israel shall comply with the College Policy #2-07 “Practice Management 
         Considerations for Physicians Who Cease to Practise, Take an Extended Leave of 
         Absence or Close Their Practice Due to Relocation”, a copy of which is attached at 
         Schedule “A” to this Order; and 
   o     Dr. Israel will participate in and unconditionally pass the PROBE Ethics & 
         Boundaries Program offered by the Centre for Personalized Education for 
         Professionals, with a report or reports to be provided by the provider to the College 
         regarding Dr. Israel’s progress and compliance. Dr. Israel will complete this 
         requirement within 6 months of the date of this Order. 
-     Dr. Israel attend before the panel to be reprimanded. 
-     Dr. Israel to pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000.00 within 30 days of the 
      date of this Order.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): May 13, 2019 1:00 a.m. start time