skip to content

Kolker, Sabrina Meghan

CPSO#: 98252

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Dec 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Dec 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Family Health Team
60 Murray Street
4th Floor
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586 4800
Fax: 4165863175 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:06 Dec 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SABRINA MEGHAN KOLKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOLKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 06 Mar 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 07 Mar 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 22 Oct 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Oct 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2017