skip to content

Kolber, Stanley Lyon

CPSO#: 25476

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 15 Aug 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 15 Aug 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 7-Dec-2013

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd. Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto, Ontario M9L 0A3 Tel: 1-800-775-0093 Fax: (647) 933-2904 Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 09 May 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 25 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 1973
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 15 Aug 2013