skip to content

Kolawole, Rebecca Olaide Omowunmi

CPSO#: 96550

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medscan Healthcare
Suite 102
71 King Street W
Mississauga ON  L5B 4A2
Phone: (905) 279-1144 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Rebecca Kolawole Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 29 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kolawole ( CPSO# 96550 )

Business Address:
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2900

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Manitouwadge General Hospital Manitouwadge
McCausland Hospital Terrace Bay
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:03 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. REBECCA OLAIDE OMOWUNMI KOLAWOLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOLAWOLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 24 Aug 2011
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 25 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Oct 2012
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 2014