Kolawole, Olubukola Folayemi (CPSO#: 96940)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Mar 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Mar 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Yoruba

Education:Obafemi Awolowo University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Healthcare
West 5th Campus
Department of Psychiatry
100 West 5th St
Hamilton ON  L9C 0E3
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Joseph's Healthcare
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. O. Kolawole Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 14 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Kolawole ( CPSO# 96940 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare
Department of Psychiatry
100 West 5th Street
P.O. Box 585
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K5
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 03 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OLUBUKOLA FOLAYEMI KOLAWOLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOLAWOLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 17 Oct 2011 to 18 Nov 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 19 Nov 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Nov 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 08 May 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Mar 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2019