skip to content

Kolar, Dusan

CPSO#: 96820

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Oct 2011
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2022
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Oct 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Belgrade, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queens University
Department of Psychiatry
Providence Care Hospital
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone: (613) 544-4900 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kolar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kolar ( CPSO# 96820 )

Business Address:
Queen's University, Department of Psychiatry
Providence Care - Mental Health
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 544-4900

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:29 May 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Oct 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Apr 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2022

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 07 Apr 2017 Active
             1.    Dr. Dusan Kolar may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Psychiatry,  Queen's  University,  in  which  Dr.  Kolar  holds  an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued on October 1, 2011, and expires on June 30,
                  2022.   Upon  renewal of Dr.  Kolar's  academic  appointment  at  Queen's
                  University, the  expiry  date can be extended, subject to the limitations
                  in paragraphs 1 above.