skip to content

Kojori, Fatemeh

CPSO#: 92274

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 May 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 May 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
737 Silver Seven Road, Unit 5
Ottawa ON  K2V 0H3
Phone: (613) 828 3122
Fax: (613) 672 2010 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Mehrdad Golian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 02 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Kojori ( CPSO# 92274 )
Dr. M. Golian ( CPSO# 94996 )

Business Address:
University Ottawa Health Institute
Division of Cardiology
40 Rue Ruskin Street
Room H128SA
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 696-7271

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:12 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FATEMEH KOJORI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOJORI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 19 Nov 2009 to 16 Dec 2009
EL - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 May 2015