skip to content

Koifman, Julius Yuli

CPSO#: 97708

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Aug 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health System
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: 416-747-3400 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Koifman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 14 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Koifman ( CPSO# 97708 )

Business Address:
William Osler Health System
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JULIUS YULI KOIFMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOIFMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 06 Apr 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 07 Apr 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 06 Apr 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 07 Apr 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 06 Apr 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 07 Apr 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 06 Apr 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 07 Apr 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2017