skip to content

Kohli, Kapil

CPSO#: 96000

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Jan 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Jan 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
16715 Yonge Street Unit 22B
Newmarket ON  L3X 1X4
Phone: (905) 898-4184
Fax: (905) 898-5793 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

16715 Yonge St Unit 22B
Toronto ON  L3X 1X4
Canada
Phone: (416) 533-7935
Fax: (905) 898-5793
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

59 Lawson Rd
Scarborough ON  M1C 2J1
Canada
Phone: (416) 284-9235
Fax: (905) 898-5793
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kohli Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 03 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Kohli ( CPSO# 96000 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KAPIL KOHLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOHLI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2014