Kocovski, Linda (CPSO#: 96532)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Apr 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sydney, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
Forensic Pathology Unit
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 46530
Fax: 905-524-2681
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINDA KOCOVSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOCOVSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 07 Jul 2011 to 28 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - General Pathology

McMaster University, 29 Sep 2011 to 06 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 07 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 06 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 07 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 06 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 07 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 06 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 07 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Forensic Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2017